VA HB747 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax exemption; veterinarians. Exempts veterinarians from sales and use tax on the purchase or prescription of drugs and medicines.
Title
Veterinarians; exemption from sales and use tax on purchase or prescription of drugs and medicines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 16-N) (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 16-N) (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Finance (18-Y 4-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 16-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (84-Y 16-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-07 | House | Reported from Finance (18-Y 4-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101515D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 609.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 609.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |