VA HB752 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1115)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1115)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Postrelease incarceration of felons sentenced for certain offenses. Clarifies that offenders who are convicted of knowingly failing to register or reregister with, or knowingly providing materially false information to, the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry are subject to added terms of postrelease incarceration. The bill also clarifies that when a sentence is imposed upon conviction of a felony that includes an active term of incarceration and the court does not order a suspended term of confinement of at least six months, a period of postrelease incarceration shall be imposed that is not less than six months or more than three years. The bill also clarifies that it is the period of postrelease incarceration that is required to be suspended, not the period of postrelease supervision. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Judicial Council.
Title
Felons; postrelease incarceration of offenders sentenced for certain offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1115) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1115 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB752ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Agree To (94-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senators: Stanley, McClellan, Surovell |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Delegates: Jones, Mullin, Adams, L.R. |
2020-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-25 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108410D-S2 (1-Y 97-N) |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB752S2 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Petersen agreed to 20108410D-S2 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 20108238D-S1 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20108410D-S2 (Petersen) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108238D-S1 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB752H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106170D-H1 |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106170D-H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101431D |
Same As/Similar To
SB312 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1116)