VA HB771 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law-enforcement officers; campus police officers. Provides that campus police officers, as appointed by public and private institutions of higher education, are included within the definition of law-enforcement officer. The bill exempts campus police from undergoing a background check when purchasing a firearm, gives campus police the same authority to make arrests without a warrant as other law-enforcement officers, includes the children and spouses of campus police in the Virginia Military Survivors and Dependents Education Program, includes such officers in the Blue Alert Program, and adds campus police employed by a public institution to the list of officers entitled to the hypertension/heart disease and infectious disease presumptions under the Virginia Workers' Compensation Act.
Title
Campus police officers; included in definition of law-enforcement officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0776) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 776 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB771ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 1-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB771ER) | |
2012-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-07 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) | |
2012-03-07 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 12105653D-S1 (97-Y 1-N) | |
2012-03-06 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2012-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB771S1 | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12105653D-S1 | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-03-02 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-29 | Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12105653D-S1 | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-06 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety | |
2012-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-03 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (20-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #2 | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #3 | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100761D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 187 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |