VA HB787 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Multi-jurisdiction grand jury; hate crimes. Adds the following to the list of crimes that a multi-jurisdiction grand jury may investigate: (i) simple assault or assault and battery where the victim was intentionally selected because of his race, religious conviction, gender, disability, gender identity, sexual orientation, color, or national origin; (ii) entering the property of another for purposes of damaging such property or its contents or interfering with the rights of the owner, user, or occupant where such property was intentionally selected because of the race, religious conviction, gender, disability, gender identity, sexual orientation, color, or national origin of the owner, user, or occupant; and (iii) various offenses that tend to cause violence.
Title
Multi-jurisdiction grand jury; hate crimes.
Sponsors
Sen. Lamont Bagby [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Jerrauld Jones [D] |
Del. Marcia Price [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 6-N) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 6-N) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0747) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 747 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB787ER) |
2020-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 20102657D-E |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB787E |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102657D |