VA HB814 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Eligibility for TANF; drug-related felonies. Provides that a person who is otherwise eligible to receive Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) shall not be denied such assistance solely because he has been convicted of a felony offense of possession of a controlled substance in violation of § 18.2-250, provided that such person is complying with, or has already complied with, all obligations imposed by the criminal court, is actively engaged in or has completed a substance abuse treatment program, participates in periodic drug screenings, and meets any other obligations as determined by the Department of Social Services.
Title
TANF; eligibility for drug-related felonies.
Sponsors
Del. Jeion Ward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB566-Guzman) by voice vote |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Social Services |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102605D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB814 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB814+hil |