VA HB849 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0551)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0551)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Political campaign advertisements; applicability of disclosure requirements to advertisements placed or promoted for a fee on an online platform; identification and certification requirements. Subjects any message that is placed or promoted for a fee on an online platform to the same disclosure requirements to which print media, television, and radio advertisements are subject. The bill adds definitions for purposes of the political advertisement disclosure requirements for "online platform," "online political advertisement," and "online political advertiser." The bill expands the definition of "print media" to include any non-video or non-audio message placed or promoted for a fee on an online platform, subjects advertisements in video format that are placed or promoted for a fee on an online platform to the same disclosure requirements to which television advertisements are subject, and subjects advertisements in audio format that are placed or promoted for a fee on an online platform to the same disclosure requirements to which radio advertisements are subject. The bill also requires online platforms to establish reasonable procedures to enable online political advertisers to identify themselves as online political advertisers and to certify to the online platform that they are permitted to lawfully purchase or promote for a fee online political advertisements.
Title
Political campaign advertisements; disclosure requirements, advertisements placed, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: No action taken by Privileges and Elections (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - House: Tabled in Privileges and Elections (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: No action taken by Privileges and Elections (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - House: Tabled in Privileges and Elections (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0551) | |
2020-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 551 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB849ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Adoption (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108333D-S1 (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB849S1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108333D-S1 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108333D-S1 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-30 | House | VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Nay 3 - Cole, M.L., Adams, L.R., McGuire |
2020-01-24 | House | Convers-Fowler, Reid, Askew, Simonds, Orrock, O'Quinn, Head, Rush, Bloxom, Runion |
2020-01-24 | House | Yea - 19 Lindsey, Simon, Sickles, Rasoul, Price, Krizek, Levine, Adams, D.M., VanValkenburg, |
2020-01-24 | House | Reconsidered by Privileges and Elections - removed from table (19-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Tabled in Privileges and Elections (17-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101292D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 955 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 955.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 957 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 958 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |