VA HB861 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1074)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1074)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Best interests of the child; history of child abuse and acts of violence, force, or threat. Provides that any history of child abuse and acts of violence, force, or threat that occurred no earlier than 10 years prior to the filing of a petition for custody or visitation of a child shall be considered by a court in determining the best interests of a child.
Title
Best interests of the child; history of child abuse and acts of violence, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (2-Y 97-N) (Y: 2 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (2-Y 97-N) (Y: 2 N: 96 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (2-Y 97-N) (Y: 2 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (2-Y 97-N) (Y: 2 N: 96 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1074) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1074 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB861ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Conference substitute printed 20109724D-H1 |
2020-03-05 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senators: Favola, Stuart, Surovell |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-24 | House | Delegates: Levine, Heretick, Kilgore |
2020-02-24 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-24 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 97-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108180D-S1 (2-Y 97-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB861S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108180D-S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108180D-S1 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104789D |
Same As/Similar To
SB105 (Same As) 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1075)