VA HB866 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0786)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0786)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Christiansburg. Updates the town boundary description. Other changes alter the method for filling vacancies on council or in the office of mayor, require an annual audit of the town's financial records, delete or update numerous obsolete provisions, and make technical corrections.
Title
Charter; Town of Christiansburg.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0786) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Enacted, Chapter 786 (effective 7/1/14) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB866ER2) |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB866ER) |
2014-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB866H1 |
2014-01-30 | House | Substitute by Delegate Rush agreed to 14104524D-H1 |
2014-01-30 | House | Floor substitute printed 14104524D-H1 (Rush) |
2014-01-30 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2014-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102756D |