VA HB872 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0718)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0718)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration by mail; certain first-time voters permitted to vote by absentee ballot. Adds to the list of exceptions to the requirement that first-time voters who registered to vote by mail must vote in person those voters who are entitled under current law to vote by absentee ballot because they are confined while awaiting trial or for having been convicted of a misdemeanor.
Title
Voter registration by mail; certain first-time voters permitted to vote by absentee ballot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 17-N) (Y: 20 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0718) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 718 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB872ER) |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (20-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB872H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107265D-H1 |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Incorporates HB185 (Simon) |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107265D-H1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101730D |
Same As/Similar To
HB185 (Similar To) 2020-01-31 - Incorporated by Privileges and Elections