VA HB885 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0444)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0444)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reckless driving; exceeding speed limit. Raises the threshold for per se reckless driving for speeding from driving in excess of 80 miles per hour to driving in excess of 85 miles per hour. The threshold for per se reckless driving for speeding for driving at or more than 20 miles per hour in excess of the speed limit remains unchanged. The bill also provides that any person who drives a motor vehicle at a speed in excess of 80 miles per hour but below 86 miles per hour on any highway in the Commonwealth having a maximum speed limit of 65 miles per hour shall be subject to an additional fine of $100.
Title
Reckless driving; raises threshold for speeding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 18-N) (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (82-Y 18-N) (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0444) | |
2020-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 444 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB885ER) |
2020-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 11-N) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N 1-A) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (11-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (82-Y 18-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (82-Y 18-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 20106070D-EH1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB885EH1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee on Appropriations amendments agreed to |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee on Transportation substitute agreed to 20106070D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (12-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-23 | House | Incorporates HB1374 (Campbell, J.L.) |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106070D-H1 |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102149D |
Same As/Similar To
SB63 (Same As) 2020-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0445)
HB1374 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - Incorporated by Transportation
HB1374 (Same As) 2020-01-23 - Incorporated by Transportation