VA HB888 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax exemption; gun safes. Establishes an exemption from retail sales tax for a gun safe with a selling price of $1,500 or less. The bill defines "gun safe" as a safe or vault that is (i) commercially available, (ii) secured with a digital or dial combination locking mechanism or biometric locking mechanism, and (iii) designed for the storage of a firearm or of ammunition for use in a firearm. Under the bill, "gun safe" does not include a glass-faced cabinet.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; exemption for certain gun safes.
Sponsors
Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D] | Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0507) | |
2020-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 507 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB888ER) |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-02 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senators: Bell, Boysko, Ebbin |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-26 | House | Delegates: Hurst, Sullivan, Robinson |
2020-02-26 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-26 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 99-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Finance (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102042D |
Same As/Similar To
SB268 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0191)