VA HB916 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0243)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0243)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Long-Term Employment Support Services and Extended Employment Services. Requires the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to administer Long-Term Employment Support Services and Extended Employment Services to assist individuals with disabilities with maintaining employment. This bill is identical to SB 560.
Title
Long-Term Employment Support and Extended Employment Services; assisting persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] | Sen. John McGuire [R] |
Del. Brenda Pogge [R] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0243) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 243 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB916ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Finance (9-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB916H1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 18105477D-H1 |
2018-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 18105477D-H1 |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103528D |