VA HB932 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0781)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0781)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nutrient management. Provides that the Department of Conservation and Recreation operate a voluntary nutrient management program to assist owners and operators of agricultural land and turf to effectively manage and apply nutrients to their land. In developing the program, the Department is to begin testing the software for assisting owners and operators of agricultural lands and turf by July 1, 2013, and begin full implementation by July 1, 2014. The development of the software may be deferred until funds become available.
Title
Voluntary Nutrient Management Plan Program; DCR to develop training and certification program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0781) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 781 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB932ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | House: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2012-03-10 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB932ER) | |
2012-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-14 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-14 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB932H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Appropriations Committee substitute agreed to 12105338D-H1 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee amendments rejected | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-12 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105338D-H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-03 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-01 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-02-01 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-23 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: Chesapeake | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100613D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 104.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 2128.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |