VA HB967 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0847)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0847)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Assisted living facility and group home; no more than 8 aged, infirmed, etc., persons shall reside. Expands certain provisions that currently apply to the Counties of Arlington and York statewide. The existing provisions declare that zoning ordinances for all purposes shall consider a residential facility in which no more than eight aged, infirmed, or disabled persons reside with one or more resident counselors or other staff persons as residential occupancy by a single family.
Title
Assisted living facility and group home; no more than 8 aged, infirmed, etc., persons shall reside.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0847) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 847 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB967ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB967ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-09 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105230D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB967S1 | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 10105230D-S1 | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 10105230D-S1 | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB967H1 | |
2010-02-02 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104793D-H1 | |
2010-02-02 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-01 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-29 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104793D-H1 | |
2010-01-29 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2010-01-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-01-13 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103869D |
Same As/Similar To
SB338 (Same As) 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0796)