VA HB987 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0147)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-5)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0147)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agricultural operations; nuisance. Requires agricultural operations to be in substantial compliance, defined in the bill, with applicable laws, regulations, and best management practices in order to be exempt from becoming a public or private nuisance. The bill prohibits a person from bringing a nuisance action against any agricultural operation the existence of which was known or reasonably knowable when that person's use or occupancy of his property began. The bill also prohibits anyone other than a person with an ownership interest in the affected property from bringing an action for private nuisance and sets out certain limitations on recovery for compensatory damages. This bill is identical to SB 567.
Title
Agricultural operations; nuisance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0147) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 147 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB987ER) |
2018-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Printed as engrossed 18102813D-E |
2018-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB987E |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102813D |