VA HB990 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791)
Summary
Pyramid promotional schemes; penalty. Revises the definition of "pyramid promotional scheme," "compensation," and "consideration" and provides that in addition to the Class 1 misdemeanor for contriving, preparing, setting up, operating, advertising or promoting a pyramid promotional scheme, such activity constitutes a prohibited practice under the Virginia Consumer Protection Act. This bill is identical to
Title
Pyramid promotional schemes; definition thereof, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Clifford Athey [R] | Del. Robert Bell [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] |
Del. Donald Merricks [R] | Del. Beverly Sherwood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0791) | |
2008-04-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 791 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-26 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB990ER) | |
2008-03-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-07 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-07 | Senate: Reading of conference report waived | |
2008-03-07 | House: Conference substitute printed 080361432-H2 | |
2008-03-06 | House: Delegates: Bell, Peace, Valentine | |
2008-03-06 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senators: Reynolds, Lucas, Puller | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2008-03-06 | House: House acceded to request | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2008-03-06 | Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (0-Y 98-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate substitute rejected by House (0-Y 98-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB990S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080912432-S1 | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080912432-S1 | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB990H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 080871432-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Committee substitute printed 080871432-H1 | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080325432 |
Same As/Similar To
SB95 (Same As) 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB990 |