VA HJR102 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Veterans Services and Department of Taxation; feasibility of exempting military retirement income from taxation; report. Requests the Department of Veterans Services and the Department of Taxation (the agencies) to convene a joint working group to study the feasibility of exempting military retirement income from taxation. Under current law, military retirement income is tax-exempt only if the taxpayer is the recipient of a Congressional Medal of Honor.
Title
Military retirement income; exempt from taxation.
Sponsors
Del. Luke Torian [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Rules |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102772D |