VA HJR105 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; joint subcommittee to study the emergence and integration of blockchain technology in the economy of the Commonwealth; report. Establishes a 19-member, two-year joint subcommittee to identify research and economic development opportunities to inform a statewide, comprehensive, and coordinated strategy relating to blockchain technology.
Title
Blockchain technology; joint subcommittee to study emergence & integration in the economy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103700D |