VA HJR109 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission; cost-effective care for individuals with intellectual disabilities; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study costs of care for individuals with intellectual disabilities. In conducting its study, the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission shall analyze the Commonwealth's per capita costs of care for individuals with intellectual disabilities and per capita costs of care and cost-effective methods used by other states to provide care for individuals with intellectual disabilities and shall make recommendations regarding how the Commonwealth can reduce such costs or make more efficient use of the services provided for individuals with intellectual disabilities to increase its efficiency in the provision of such care and services.
Title
Individuals with intellectual disabilities; JLARC to study cost-effective care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105310D |