VA HJR110 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; State Corporation Commission; requiring telecommunications facilities to be placed underground; report. Requests the State Corporation Commission to study the feasibility of requiring telecommunications facilities to be placed underground when overhead electric distribution lines that share the same poles are buried.
Title
Telecommunications facilities; SCC to study the feasibility of requiring underground facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103240D |