VA HJR129 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution; requesting the Attorney General to explore a challenge to the constitutionality of federal TMDL regulations; report. Requests the Attorney General of Virginia to explore a challenge to the constitutionality of certain Total Maximum Daily Load (TMDL) regulations adopted by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency regarding the Chesapeake Bay. The resolution asserts that the TMDL regulations, which are binding upon Virginia localities releasing storm waters and treated waste waters into tributaries of the Bay, essentially constitute an unfunded mandate in violation of the 10th Amendment to the United States Constitution.
Title
TMDL; Attorney General to explore challenge to constitutionality of regulations by USEPA.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: Chesapeake | |
2012-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102670D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HJ129 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HJ129+hil |