VA HJR162 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Division of Capitol Police.
Title
Commending the Division of Capitol Police.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Rules by voice vote |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Received |
2020-01-27 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2020-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-01-21 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 20105856D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HJ162 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HJ162+hil |