VA HJR19 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Study; joint committee; the future of public elementary and secondary education in the Commonwealth; report. Continues for one additional year the Joint Committee of the House Committee on Education and the Senate Committee on Education and Health to Study the Future of Public Elementary and Secondary Education in the Commonwealth, consisting of seven members of the House Committee on Education and six members of the Senate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public elementary and secondary education; joint committee to study the future in the Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-30SenateLeft in Rules
2018-02-28SenateContinued to 2019 in Rules by voice vote
2018-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2018-02-12SenateReading waived
2018-02-09HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09HouseAgreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2018-02-09HouseEngrossed by House
2018-02-09HouseTaken up
2018-02-06HouseReported from Rules (17-Y 0-N)
2018-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-12-27HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2017-12-27HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103172D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback