VA HJR30 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Virginia State Crime Commission; the low use of geriatric parole; report. Directs the Virginia State Crime Commission to study the low use of geriatric parole and the appropriate structure for increasing the use of geriatric parole.
Title
Geriatric parole; State Crime Commission to study the low use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102012D |