VA HJR36 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Joint Commission on Health Care; health care spending. Directs the Joint Commission on Health Care to study health care spending in the Commonwealth. In conducting its study, the Joint Commission on Health Care shall (i) determine the total amount of spending on health care in the Commonwealth, including the total amount of public funds and private funds spent on health care in the Commonwealth; (ii) determine the sources of funds spent on health care in the Commonwealth, including federal funds, state funds, local funds, employer-paid health insurance premiums, member-paid health insurance premiums, individual out-of-pocket spending, and uncompensated care, and the total amount for each source; (iii) determine the rates of change in health care spending, including rates of change in public and private health care spending, in the last five years; and (iv) identify the drivers of increases in health care spending in the Commonwealth.
Title
Health care spending in the Commonwealth; Joint Commission on Health Care to study.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100838D |