VA HJR37 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC; feasibility of creating a transportation authority for Planning District 16; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study the feasibility of creating a transportation authority for Planning District 16 and to report its findings by the first day of the 2021 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
Title
Planning District 16; JLARC to study creating a transportation authority.
Sponsors
Del. Joshua Cole [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103208D |