VA HJR38 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC; effects of gun violence on communities; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study the social, physical, emotional, and economic effects of gun violence on communities across the Commonwealth.
Title
Gun violence in communities; Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study effects.
Sponsors
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Alex Askew [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] |
Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 1-N) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Rules |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (3-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100942D |