VA HJR42 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ42ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ42ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Emblem for honoring fallen public safety personnel; Emblem for honoring fallen public safety personnel; the Honor and Sacrifice Flag. Designates the Honor and Sacrifice Flag as the Commonwealth's emblem for honoring the brave men and women who have given their lives for public safety.
Title
Honor and Sacrifice Flag; emblem for honoring fallen public safety personnel.
Sponsors
Del. Steve Heretick [D] | Del. Alex Askew [D] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Lee Ware [R] | Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ42ER) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reading waived |
2020-01-29 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-01-29 | House | Taken up |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100189D |
Same As/Similar To
SJ31 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ31ER)