VA HJR50 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ50ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ50ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; adaption to prevent flooding in Tidewater Virginia localities; report. Requests the Virginia Institute of Marine Science to study strategies for adaptation to prevent recurrent flooding in Tidewater and Eastern Shore Virginia localities.
Title
Flooding; Institute of Marine Science to study strategies to prevent in Tidewater localities.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth Alexander [D] | Del. Algie Howell [D] | Del. Matthew James [D] | Del. Johnny Joannou [D] |
Sen. Lynwood Lewis [D] | Del. Randall Minchew [R] | Del. Christopher Stolle [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 93-N) (Y: 3 N: 95 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 93-N) (Y: 3 N: 95 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ50ER) | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate | |
2012-03-09 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-09 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Senators: Wagner, Watkins, Howell | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2012-03-06 | House: Delegates: Stolle, Knight, Alexander | |
2012-03-06 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2012-03-06 | House: House acceded to request | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2012-03-05 | Senate: Senate insisted on amendment | |
2012-03-01 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 93-N) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Senate amendment rejected by House (3-Y 93-N) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-28 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-27 | Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-02-13 | Senate: Reading waived | |
2012-02-10 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Printed as engrossed 12103261D-E | |
2012-02-10 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HJ50E | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2012-02-10 | House: Taken up | |
2012-02-07 | House: Reported from Rules with amendments (14-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-26 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-20 | House: Assigned Rules sub: Studies | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103261D |
Subjects
Eastern Shore of Virginia
Fisheries and Habitat of Tidal Waters
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Tidewater Virginia
Fisheries and Habitat of Tidal Waters
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Tidewater Virginia