VA HJR5010 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-01 - Agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-01 - Agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Appointments by the Speaker of the House of Delegates. Confirms appointments made by the Speaker of the House of Delegates to the Tobacco Region Revitalization Commission, the Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority Board of Directors, and the Virginia Conflict of Interest and Ethics Advisory Council.
Title
Speaker of the House of Delegates; confirms various appointments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N 1-A) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: (51-Y 39-N 6-A) (Y: 51 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 2-N) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 6-N 1-A) (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: (51-Y 39-N 6-A) (Y: 51 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - House - House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 2-N) (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate (21-Y 18-N 1-A) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 6-N 1-A) |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-09-23 | Senate | Reported from Rules (12-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Reading waived |
2020-09-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ5010ER) |
2020-09-04 | House | VOTE: (51-Y 39-N 6-A) |
2020-09-04 | House | Agreed to by House (51-Y 39-N 6-A) |
2020-09-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2020-09-04 | House | Taken up |
2020-09-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-03 | House | Taken up |
2020-08-27 | House | Reported from Rules (15-Y 2-N) |
2020-08-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-08-20 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20200064D |