VA HJR578 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); right to vote. Provides that there is a right to vote and that no law shall be enacted or enforced that burdens or denies any voter of his right to vote. The amendment also requires the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions to provide all resources necessary to assist qualified voters in the exercise of their right to vote.
Title
Constitutional amendment; right to vote (first reference).
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2018-07-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-07-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100131D |