VA HJR586 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-10)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ586ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-10)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ586ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of William E. Ward.
Title
Celebrating the life of William E. Ward.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ586ER) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Received |
2019-01-14 | House | Agreed to by House |
2019-01-14 | House | Engrossed by House |
2018-10-23 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/19 19100247D |