VA HJR587 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ587ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Commending the American Legion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commending the American Legion.

Sponsors

Del. Robert Thomas [R]Del. Dawn Adams [D]Del. Les Adams [R]Del. Lashrecse Aird [D]
Del. Hala Ayala [D]Del. Richard Bell [R]Del. Robert Bell [R]Del. Robert Bloxom [R]
Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D]Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D]Del. Emily Brewer [R]Del. David Bulova [D]
Del. Kathy Byron [R]Del. Ronnie Campbell [R]Del. Betsy Carr [D]Del. Jennifer Foy [D]
Del. Lee Carter [D]Del. Mark Cole [R]Del. Christopher Collins [R]Del. Kirkland Cox [R]
Del. Glenn Davis [R]Del. Karrie Delaney [D]Del. James Edmunds [R]Del. Matt Fariss [R]
Del. Eileen Filler-Corn [D]Del. Hyland Fowler [R]Del. Nicholas Freitas [R]Del. Scott Garrett [R]
Del. Todd Gilbert [R]Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D]Del. C.E. Hayes [D]Del. Chris Head [R]
Del. Gordon Helsel [R]Del. Steve Heretick [D]Del. Charniele Herring [D]Del. Keith Hodges [R]
Del. Patrick Hope [D]Del. Timothy Hugo [R]Del. Chris Hurst [D]Del. Riley Ingram [R]
Del. Jerrauld Jones [D]Del. Chris Jones [R]Del. Mark Keam [D]Del. Barry Knight [R]
Del. Kaye Kory [D]Del. Paul Krizek [D]Del. Steven Landes [R]Del. Dave LaRock [R]
Del. James Leftwich [R]Del. Mark Levine [D]Del. Joesph Lindsey [D]Del. Alfonso Lopez [D]
Del. John McGuire [R]Del. Joseph McNamara [R]Del. James Morefield [R]Del. Michael Mullin [D]
Del. Kathleen Murphy [D]Del. Robert Orrock [R]Del. Christopher Peace [R]Del. Charles Poindexter [R]
Del. Marcia Price [D]Del. Margaret Ransone [R]Del. Sam Rasoul [D]Del. David Reid [D]
Del. Roxann Robinson [R]Del. Debra Rodman [D]Del. Danica Roem [D]Del. Marcus Simon [D]
Del. Christopher Stolle [R]Del. Richard Sullivan [D]Del. Luke Torian [D]Del. David Toscano [D]
Del. Kathy Tran [D]Del. Cheryl Turpin [D]Del. Lee Ware [R]Del. Vivian Watts [D]
Del. Michael Webert [R]Del. Tony Wilt [R]Del. Thomas Wright [R]Del. David Yancey [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ587ER)
2019-01-31SenateAgreed to by Senate by voice vote
2019-01-15SenateLaid on Clerk's Desk
2019-01-15SenateReceived
2019-01-14HouseAgreed to by House by voice vote
2019-01-14HouseEngrossed by House
2018-10-30HousePrefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/19 19100305D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback