VA HJR589 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ589ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ589ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Southside Virginia Wildlife Center.
Title
Commending the Southside Virginia Wildlife Center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ589ER) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Received |
2019-01-14 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-01-14 | House | Engrossed by House |
2018-11-15 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/19 19101319D |