VA HJR590 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Andrew Dalton Elder, Sr.
Title
Commending Andrew Dalton Elder, Sr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-24 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2019-02-24 | Senate | No further action taken |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Received |
2019-01-14 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-01-14 | House | Engrossed by House |
2018-11-15 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/19 19101320D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HJ590 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HJ590+hil |