VA HJR597 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; economic impacts of litter on fishing, farming, and water quality in urban streams; report. Requests the Department of Environmental Quality to study the economic impact of litter on fishing, farming, water quality, and other components of Virginia's economy and to propose strategies, campaigns, and necessary state actions to protect the economy of the Commonwealth from harm caused by litter and promote Virginia's economic welfare.
Title
Litter; economic impacts on fishing, farming, and water quality in urban streams, report.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 4-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-12-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101046D |