VA HJR611 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ611ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ611ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Joseph Benjamin Fuller.
Title
Celebrating the life of Joseph Benjamin Fuller.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ611ER) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Received |
2019-01-14 | House | Agreed to by House |
2019-01-14 | House | Engrossed by House |
2018-12-27 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/19 19102860D |