VA HJR613 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ613ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ613ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Trench Safety Stand Down Week. Designates the third full week of June, in 2019 and in each succeeding year, as Trench Safety Stand Down Week in Virginia.
Title
Trench Safety Stand Down Week; designating third full week of June 2019, and each succeeding year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ613ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-12-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-12-28 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101758D |