VA HJR614 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Virginia State Crime Commission; forensic nursing; report. Directs the Virginia State Crime Commission to study current access to forensic nursing programs across the Commonwealth, determine the costs associated with establishing additional programs in regions that lack coverage, identify funding sources for forensic nursing programs to assist with the costs of recovering evidence and providing expert testimony, identify opportunities to increase availability of forensic nursing certifications, evaluate existing forensic nursing programs in other states, and identify best practices that could be utilized in the Commonwealth.
Title
Forensic nursing in the Commonwealth; Virginia State Crime Commission to study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103319D |