VA HJR615 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0821)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Constitutional amendment (first resolution); apportionment; Virginia Redistricting Commission. Establishes the Virginia Redistricting Commission, a 16-member Commission tasked with establishing districts for the United States House of Representatives and for the Senate and the House of Delegates of the General Assembly. The Commission consists of eight legislative members and eight citizen members. The legislative members consist of four members of the Senate of Virginia and four members of the House of Delegates, with equal representation given to the political parties having the highest and next highest number of members in their respective houses. The citizen members are selected by a selection committee consisting of five retired judges of the circuit courts of Virginia, from lists submitted to the selection committee by the Speaker of the House of Delegates, the leader in the House of Delegates of the political party having the next highest number of members in the House of Delegates, the President pro tempore of the Senate of Virginia, and the leader in the Senate of the political party having the next highest number of members in the Senate. The Commission is required to submit to the General Assembly plans of districts for the Senate and the House of Delegates of the General Assembly no later than 45 days following the receipt of census data and plans of districts for the United States House of Representatives no later than 60 days following the receipt of census data, or July 1 of that year, whichever occurs later. The measure requires certain vote thresholds for plans, depending on the type of district, in order to be submitted to the General Assembly. No amendments may be made to a plan by the General Assembly or the Governor. The measure requires additional plans to be submitted, or additional time to be given to submit a plan, in certain circumstances, and further provides that districts will be drawn by the Supreme Court of Virginia if such efforts fail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; Virginia Redistricting Commission (first reference).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 15-N) (Y: 83 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 52-N) (Y: 47 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Agreed to by Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 48-N) (Y: 51 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0821)
2019-03-26HouseAssigned Chapter 821 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HJ615ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 15-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (83-Y 15-N)
2019-02-23HousePending question ordered
2019-02-23HouseConference substitute printed 19107738D-H3
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Barker, Vogel, Cosgrove
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Cole, Rush, Leftwich, Krizek
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-20SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-20SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: REJECTED (47-Y 52-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19106768D-S1 (47-Y 52-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenateAgreed to by Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ615S1
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106768D-S1
2019-02-18SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-14SenateRead second time
2019-02-12SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106768D-S1
2019-02-12SenateReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (11-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-02-05SenateReading waived
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (51-Y 48-N)
2019-02-04HouseAgreed to by House (51-Y 48-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HJ615H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105844D-H1
2019-02-04HouseSubstitute by Delegate Sickles ruled out of order 19106417D-H2
2019-02-04HouseTaken up
2019-02-04HouseFloor substitute printed 19106417D-H2 (Sickles)
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105844D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
2019-01-12HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-01-01HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2019-01-01HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101058D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HJ615
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HJ615+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HJ615H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HJ615H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HJ615S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HJ615H3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HJ615ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0821+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1804V0004+HJ0615
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H18V0026+HJ0615
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2294+HJ0615
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S08V0118+HJ0615
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0776HJ0615+HJ0615
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3086+HJ0615
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0864HJ0615+HJ0615
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1106HJ0615+HJ0615
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3339+HJ0615

Bill Comments

feedback