VA HJR623 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Left in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Celebrating the life of Matthew Wayne Shepard.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Celebrating the life of Matthew Wayne Shepard.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateLeft in Rules
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2019-01-22SenateReading waived
2019-01-21HouseAgreed to by House
2019-01-21HouseEngrossed by House
2019-01-14HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-04HousePrefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/09/19 19100525D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback