VA HJR636 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Social Services; creation of database and resource to obtain background information on personal caregivers; report. Requests the Department of Social Services to study the feasibility and cost of creating a database and resource through which individuals seeking to employ a personal caregiver could obtain comprehensive background information regarding the prospective caregiver, including the results of a national criminal history background check and a search of the central registry maintained pursuant to §63.2-1515, the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry maintained pursuant to §9.1-902, and any employee disqualification lists maintained by state agencies.
Title
DSS; creation of database and resource to obtain background information on personal caregivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100734D |