VA HJR653 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Department of Health; naloxone storage and access; report. Requests the Department of Health to study the feasibility of expanding naloxone access through the placement of naloxone in automated external defibrillator (AED) cabinets across the Commonwealth.
Title
Health, Department of; naloxone storage and access, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104192D |