VA HJR657 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-01 - Stricken from docket by Privileges and Elections (21-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-01 - Stricken from docket by Privileges and Elections (21-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Constitutional amendment (first resolution); real property tax exemption; surviving spouse of a disabled veteran; date of veteran's disability and death. Provides that, as of January 1, 2021, the real property tax exemption for the surviving spouse of a 100 percent disabled veteran shall apply regardless of whether the disabled veteran died prior to January 1, 2011. Under the current constitutional real property tax exemption, if a veteran received a 100 percent disability rating and died prior to January 1, 2011, his surviving spouse is not eligible for the exemption pursuant to state statutory law.
Title
Constitutional amendment; real property tax exemption, surviving spouse of a disabled veteran.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-01 - House - House: Stricken from docket by Privileges and Elections (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | Stricken from docket by Privileges and Elections (21-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101855D |