VA HJR673 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC; Virginia Public Guardian and Conservator Program; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study the operations and performance of the Virginia Public Guardian and Conservator Program.
Title
JLARC; Virginia Public Guardian and Conservator Program, report.
Sponsors
Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Sen. Lashrecse Aird [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103905D |