VA HJR677 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-24 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Study; joint subcommittee to study the emergence and integration of blockchain technology in the economy of the Commonwealth; report. Establishes a 21-member joint subcommittee to identify blockchain technology research and economic development opportunities with the goal of creating a statewide, comprehensive, and coordinated strategy relating to blockchain technology. In conducting its study, the joint subcommittee shall analyze and consider (i) economic development opportunities in the Commonwealth available through the utilization of blockchain technology; (ii) different types of blockchain technology and the feasibility of economic development for each type; (iii) the creation of a statewide, comprehensive, coordinated strategy to encourage commercial activity in the blockchain technology sector; (iv) opportunities for deployment of blockchain technology in state government; and (v) strategies to incentivize the development of blockchain companies in the Commonwealth. The joint subcommittee shall submit its report to the Governor and the 2020 and 2021 Regular Sessions of the General Assembly.
Title
Blockchain technology; joint subcommittee to study emergence & integration in the economy.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-24 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2019-02-24 | House | No further action taken |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: McDougle, Obenshain, Deeds |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Rush, Knight, Rasoul |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 19107276D-S1 (0-Y 99-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate with substitute by voice vote |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HJ677S1 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19107276D-S1 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19107276D-S1 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103191D |