VA HJR679 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; Virginia Retirement System; part-time public school teachers; report. Requests the Virginia Retirement System to study the impact of permitting part-time public school teachers to participate in a retirement plan administered by the Virginia Retirement System.
Title
Virginia Retirement System; part-time public school teachers, report.
Sponsors
Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Wendy Gooditis [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Debra Rodman [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Del. Cheryl Turpin [D] | Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102079D |