VA HJR681 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC; impact of changes in health care financing and delivery on charity care; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study how recent changes in health care financing and delivery in the Commonwealth, including Medicaid expansion and enactment of assessments on providers of health care services, will affect the demand for charity care and ability of health care providers to meet charity care requirements imposed on certificates of public need, as well as the organization and operation of medical care facilities subject to the Commonwealth's certificate of public need laws.
Title
JLARC; impact of changes in health care financing and delivery on charity care.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102367D |