VA HJR7 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Stricken at request of Patron in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Stricken at request of Patron in Rules by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Master Sergeant Sae Jin Park-Schneider, USA.
Title
Celebrating the life of Master Sergeant Sae Jin Park-Schneider, USA.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Senate | Stricken at request of Patron in Rules by voice vote |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Reading waived |
2020-01-13 | House | Agreed to by House |
2020-01-13 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-11-25 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/08/20 20101229D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HJ7 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HJ7+hil |