VA HJR716 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-8)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ716ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-8)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ716ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Honorable Daun Sessoms Hester.
Title
Commending the Honorable Daun Sessoms Hester.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ716ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate with amendments by voice vote |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendments by voice vote |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Reading waived |
2019-01-21 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2019-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-01-21 | House | Taken up for immediate consideration |
2019-01-15 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 19100782D |